This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

Ivey Roofing, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Ivey Roofing, Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Hartford Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03214

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Ivey Roofing, Inc.

Ivey Roofing, Inc.

Defendants

Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S. Owen Griffin

Attorney at Troppito Miller Griffin LLC - KCMO

105 East Fifth Street, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64106

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt S. Brack

Attorney at Brown & Ruprecht, PC

2323 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

G. Steven Ruprecht

Attorney at Brown & Ruprecht, PC

2323 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Ivey Roofing, Inc. against Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC, Hartford Fire Insurance Company filed by S. Owen Griffin on behalf of Ivey Roofing, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 6352867. ( Service due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, S. Owen) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

2 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of appearance by G. Steven Ruprecht on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC (Attorney G. Steven Ruprecht added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Ruprecht, G.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Separate Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer,, Complaint, on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC.(Attorney Kurt S. Brack added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Brack, Kurt) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE filed by Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE filed by Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of appearance by G. Steven Ruprecht on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC (Attorney G. Steven Ruprecht added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Ruprecht, G.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Separate Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer,, Complaint, on behalf of Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC.(Attorney Kurt S. Brack added to party Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC(pty:dft))(Brack, Kurt) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Ivey Roofing, Inc. against Vasquez Commercial Contracting, LLC, Hartford Fire Insurance Company filed by S. Owen Griffin on behalf of Ivey Roofing, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 6352867. ( Service due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, S. Owen) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.