This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 09:09:59 (UTC).

Itschner v. HNTB Corp

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Itschner filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HNTB Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02137

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Itschner

Defendant

HNTB Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rex Maxwell Martinez

Attorney at HKM Employment Attorneys LLP

1785 East Sahara, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Dana Sniegocki

Attorney at HKM Employment Attorneys LLP

1785 East Sahara, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Jenny L Foley

Attorney at HKM EMPLOYMENT ATTORNEYS LLP

1785 East Sahara, Suite 325

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Defendant Attorney

D. Lee Roberts, Jr

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HNTB Corp that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate HNTB Holdings Ltd, Other Affiliate 1914 Holding Company for HNTB Corp added. (Roberts, D.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by HNTB Corp. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/11/2021.(Roberts, D.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Itschner re #4 Summons Issued. HNTB Corp served on 11/24/2020. (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to HNTB Corp. (JM) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tina Itschner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6264022) by Tina Itschner. Proof of service due by 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HNTB Corp that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate HNTB Holdings Ltd, Other Affiliate 1914 Holding Company for HNTB Corp added. (Roberts, D.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by HNTB Corp. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/11/2021.(Roberts, D.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Itschner re #4 Summons Issued. HNTB Corp served on 11/24/2020. (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to HNTB Corp. (JM) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tina Itschner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6264022) by Tina Itschner. Proof of service due by 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HNTB CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex Maxwell Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenny L Foley