This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2022 at 15:23:44 (UTC).

It Works Marketing et al v. Melaleuca et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 It Works Marketing filed an Other lawsuit against Melaleuca. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jared C. Bennett and Ted Stewart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-MC-00056

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

Presiding Judge

Ted Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

It Works Marketing

Petitioner

Collette Boden

Defendants

Kimberly Bertolucci

Amber Hoerner

Katie Herold

Brandon Olive

Sarah Rankin

Kimberly McCauley

Geneveve Sykes

Jeanie McWhorter

Joshua Rankin

Melaleuca

Makenzie Schultz

Kellie Kaufman

Lea Piccoli

Sean Sykes

Ashley Olive

Steven Schultz

Consolidated Defendant

Amanda Gully

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hayden Duffy

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Bryan S. Johansen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Ernest Joseph Marquart

Attorney at SHUMAKER LOOP & KENDRICK LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

Hayden Lawson Duffy

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeffrey B. Fabian

Attorney at SHUMAKER LOOP & KENDRICK LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

Jeffrey J. Hunt

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

John C.C. Sanders, Jr

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

John Sullivan

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Katrina G. Eash

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Rachel Koehn

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Clinton Seth Ensign

Attorney at MANNING CURTIS BRADSHAW & BEDNAR PLLC

136 E South Temple Ste 1300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jess M. Krannich

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

60 E South Temple

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Douglas C. Dreier

Attorney at WILEY REIN LLP

1776 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Richard W. Smith

Attorney at WILEY REIN LLP

1776 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Clinton Seth Ensign

Attorney at MANNING CURTIS BRADSHAW & BEDNAR PLLC

136 E South Temple Ste 1300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Robert J. Stovash

Attorney at STOVASH CASE & TINGLEY PA

220 N Rosalind Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

J. Andrew Law

Attorney at MELALEUCA INC

4609 W 65Th St

Idaho Falls, ID 83402

 

Court Documents

#21

RESTRICTED

#17

#16

#15

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal

#13

12 #7

Exhibit F

12 #6

Exhibit E

12 #5

Exhibit D

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

2 #5

Exhibit E - Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Co

2 #4

Exhibit D - Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Compel Mediation and Arbitr

2 #3

Exhibit C - Melaleuca's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit B - Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages

2 #1

Exhibit A - Subpoena to Collette Boden

#2

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated Per ECF 20 Order. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case. (reb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Conference Hearing held on February 18, 2021 before Judge Jared C. Bennett. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Robinson, RPR, FCRR, CSR, CP, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2021. (jrj) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #2 Motion to Quash Subpoena for failure to comply with DUCivR 37-1(a)(1), (a)(4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 02/18/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2021 re #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Memorandum in Support filed by Collette Boden. All parties appeared by ZOOM. The court hears from counsel. The court DENIES without Prejudice #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Memorandum in Support. Written Order to Follow. Attorney for Plaintiff: John C.C. Sanders, Jr.; Jeffrey J. Hunt, Hayden Lawson Duffy for IT Works Attorney for Defendant: Seth Ensign for Ms. Boden Court Reporter: electronic ZOOM 7.100.(ksm) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Setting ZOOM Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Judges Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Zoom Instructions will be sent to all parties prior to the hearing, The general public is to notify Judge Bennett's chambers at 801-524-6620 24 hours in advance if they wish to attend/listen in on Zoom hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/11/21. (ksm) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/3/2021. (reb) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr for It Works Marketing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/3/2021. (reb) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C.C. Sanders Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3896656,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification o filed by Plaintiff It Works Marketing. (Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #13 MOTION to Seal Document #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff It Works MarketingNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Seal Document #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff It Works Marketing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C.C. Sanders Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3896656,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff It Works Marketing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (John C.C. Sanders, Jr.))(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hayden L. Duffy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-3896656,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff It Works Marketing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Hayden L. Duffy))(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of It Works Marketing (Hunt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Johansen on behalf of It Works Marketing (Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REFUND REQUEST FOR DUPLICATE FEE PAYMENT re Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee filed by Ensign, Clinton.Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Ensign, Clinton) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jess M. Krannich on behalf of Collette Boden (Krannich, Jess) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/26/2020. (tlc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioner Collette Boden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Collette Boden, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages, #3 Exhibit C - Melaleuca's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Compel Mediation and Arbitration, #5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Ensign, Clinton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #6 Docket sheet - USDC Middle Florida) (rks). (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Collette Boden received from Petitioner Collette Boden. (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AUTDC-3891213). (Ensign, Clinton) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Petitioner Collette Boden is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 49.00 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Quash and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Melaleuca Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hayden Lawson Duffy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan S. Johansen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey James Hunt