Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:15:48 (UTC).

Isom v. Infinity County Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Isom filed an Other lawsuit against Infinity County Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00275

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyesha N. Isom

Dallas, TX 75208

Defendant

Infinity County Mutual Insurance

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Tyesha N. Isom as to #5 Order. (mem) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: ORDERED that no later than Thursday, May 6, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff Tyesha N. Isom shall provide the Clerk of Court with her current physical mailing address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/15/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/14/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate referral

#3

(#3) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

2 #1

Envelope(s)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyesha N. Isom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

1 #2

Envelope(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Infinity County Mutual Insurance, filed by Tyesha N. Isom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope(s))(mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Tyesha N. Isom as to #5 Order. (mem) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: ORDERED that no later than Thursday, May 6, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff Tyesha N. Isom shall provide the Clerk of Court with her current physical mailing address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/15/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/14/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyesha N. Isom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Infinity County Mutual Insurance, filed by Tyesha N. Isom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope(s))(mem) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant