This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 08:15:19 (UTC).

Ismael v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 Ismael filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer A. Dorsey and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent Ismael

Defendants

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Rausch Sturm LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gustavo E. Ponce

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group, APC

6069 S. Fort Apache Rd., Ste.100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Mona Amini

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group, APC

6069 S. Fort Apache Rd., Ste.100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant Attorneys

Lori N. Brown

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

2 North Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Andrew Clark

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6785408) by Vincent Ismael. Proof of service due by 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Ponce, Gustavo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/03/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vincent Ismael. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP. (DRS) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Brown, Lori) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 3/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified link to correct document on 3/10/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 4/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Brown, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Brown, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 4/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation; Rausch Sturm LLP answer due 3/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified link to correct document on 3/10/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Brown, Lori) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm LLP. (DRS) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vincent Ismael. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ponce, Gustavo) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6785408) by Vincent Ismael. Proof of service due by 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Ponce, Gustavo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik L L P is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori Nadine Brown(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Clark