This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 11:01:27 (UTC).

Iskhakova v. Triple J Bedding, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Iskhakova filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Triple J Bedding, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Hector Gonzalez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04979

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hector Gonzalez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marina Iskhakova

Defendant

Triple J Bedding, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Ste 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Triple J Bedding, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by October 7, 2022, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 8/24/2022. (Herrmann, Brendan) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#6

(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint letter and case management plan by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion, see ECF No. #6 , for an extension of the deadline to file the joint letter and case management plan required by the Court's scheduling order, see ECF No. #5 . The parties shall file their joint letter and case management plan on or before December 5, 2022. Plaintiff is hereby warned that failure to complete service within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) shall result in dismissal unless she demonstrates good cause for an extension. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 10/7/2022. (BH) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint letter and case management plan by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by October 7, 2022, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 8/24/2022. (Herrmann, Brendan) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Triple J Bedding, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Triple J Bedding, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15870221 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Marina Iskhakova. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Triple J Bedding) (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Rozenberg