This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 09:41:20 (UTC).

Iskhakova v. Sit Down New York, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Iskhakova filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Sit Down New York, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04980

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marina Iskhakova

Defendant

Sit Down New York, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Ste 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Sit Down New York, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 10/5/2022 at 11:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 4980#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/24/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marina Iskhakova. Sit Down New York, Inc. served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 11/10/2022 at 3:00 PM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 4980#. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at #5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/21/2022. (PW) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marina Iskhakova. Sit Down New York, Inc. served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 10/27/2022 at 7:00 PM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 4980#. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at #5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/30/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Marina Iskhakova. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 10/5/2022 at 11:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 4980#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/24/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sit Down New York, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketFILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15870312 (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sit Down New York, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Marina Iskhakova. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Sit Down New York) (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Rozenberg