This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:11:07 (UTC).

ISHAM v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 ISHAM filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05714

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARRY ISHAM

Defendants

COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC.

TRANS UNION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK D. MAILMAN

Attorney at FRANCIS & MAILMAN, PC

1600 Market Street, 25Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GEOFFREY H. BASKERVILLE

Attorney at FRANCIS MAILMAN SOUMILAS, P.C.

Pnc Building, 25Th Floor, 1600 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL T. SWEENEY

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel

1111 Manning Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

WHITNEY L. WHITE

Attorney at SESSIONS FISHMAN NATHAN & ISRAEL LLC

900 Jackson St Suite 440

Dallas, TX 75204

ERIK J. JONES

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC...(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 5, 2020 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS ROOM 3809, BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 01/29/2020. 01/29/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WHITNEY WHITE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/29/20. 1/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney L. White, Esq. by COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14075228.). (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#8

(#8) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(JONES, ERIK) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARRY ISHAM. (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERIK J. JONES TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/19/2019. 12/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Jones, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13996692.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARRY ISHAM. COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/8/2020. (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY H. BASKERVILLE on behalf of GARRY ISHAM (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13966262.), filed by GARRY ISHAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(MAILMAN, MARK) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC...(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 5, 2020 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS ROOM 3809, BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 01/29/2020. 01/29/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WHITNEY WHITE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/29/20. 1/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney L. White, Esq. by COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14075228.). (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(JONES, ERIK) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARRY ISHAM. (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERIK J. JONES TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/19/2019. 12/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik J. Jones, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13996692.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARRY ISHAM. COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/8/2020. (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket2 Summons Issued as to COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/5/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by GARRY ISHAM. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY H. BASKERVILLE on behalf of GARRY ISHAM (BASKERVILLE, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13966262.), filed by GARRY ISHAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(MAILMAN, MARK) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.