Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 08:10:00 (UTC).

Iseman et al v. Werner

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Iseman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Werner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alyssa Iseman

Positively Medieval, LLC

Defendant

M Jacob Werner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S Kelley

Attorney at Kennerly, Montgomery & Finley, P.C.

550 Main St., Bank Of America Center, 4Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

Richard E Ladd, Jr

Attorney at Penn Stuart & Eskridge

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620-2266

Karissa Hazzard Range

Attorney at Penn Stuart & Eskridge

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620-2266

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Range, Karissa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 12:00 PM in Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/13/2019. (TRT) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

13 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form

#13

(#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019, at 12:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 11/4/2019. (CMH) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by M Jacob Werner.(Ladd, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit Opinion Letter

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against M Jacob Werner., filed by Alyssa Iseman, Positively Medieval, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion Letter)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#9

(#9) SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to M. Jacob Werner on 10/2/19 (Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Positively Medieval, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Positively Medieval, LLC for Positively Medieval, LLC. (Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY***Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint :Summons and Civil cover Sheet are interactive. Please make sure all documents are flattened. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to M Jacob Werner. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against M Jacob Werner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4084175.), filed by Alyssa Iseman, Positively Medieval, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Range, Karissa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 12:00 PM in Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/13/2019. (TRT) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019, at 12:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 11/4/2019. (CMH) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by M Jacob Werner.(Ladd, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against M Jacob Werner., filed by Alyssa Iseman, Positively Medieval, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion Letter)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to M. Jacob Werner on 10/2/19 (Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Positively Medieval, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Positively Medieval, LLC for Positively Medieval, LLC. (Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY***Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint :Summons and Civil cover Sheet are interactive. Please make sure all documents are flattened. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2019. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to M Jacob Werner. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Positively Medieval, LLC. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BDG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons by Alyssa Iseman, Positively Medieval, LLC. (Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against M Jacob Werner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4084175.), filed by Alyssa Iseman, Positively Medieval, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard E Ladd, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karissa Hazzard Range