This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:24:02 (UTC).

ISD Trenton, LLC v. Continental Benefits, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 ISD Trenton, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Continental Benefits, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00825

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISD Trenton, LLC

Defendants

Continental Benefits, LLC

New Jersey Education Association

New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan

Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Lewis Greyber

Attorney at Callagy Law, PC

Suite 310W, 1900 Nw Corporate Blvd.

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorneys

D. Ty Jackson

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

301 S Bronough St - Ste 600, Po Box 11189

Tallahassee, FL 32301-3189

Robert F. McKee

Attorney at Robert F. McKee, P.A.

1718 E 7Th Ave Ste 301

Tampa, FL 33605

Abigail V. Carter

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC

805 15Th St Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005-2207

Adam Bellotti

805 15Th St Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005-2207

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Bellotti, Adam) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#35

(#35) MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Bellotti, Adam) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#33

(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Greyber, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#31

(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greyber, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#21

(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greyber, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#20

(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greyber, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#19

(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greyber, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) NOTICE to counsel Abigail V. Carter and Adam Bellotti of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LSS) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to Removal (Jackson, D.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Continental Benefits, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to Removal (Jackson, D.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Other Documents

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#4) NOTICE by Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to Removal (Jackson, D.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Bellotti, Adam) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File. Within seven days of the date of this Order, Defendants New Jersey Education Association and New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan may file a reply, not to exceed five pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/6/2019. (JMF) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Bellotti, Adam) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ENDORSED ORDER referring motions for report and recommendation: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc., #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan, New Jersey Education Association, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Continental Benefits, LLC. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (SMB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Greyber, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/28/2019. (JSK) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ISD Trenton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greyber, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ENDORSED ORDER referring motion for report and recommendation: #14 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by ISD Trenton, LLC. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/22/2019. (SMB) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/1/2020; Dispositive motions due by 7/17/2020; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 5, 2020 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Jury Trial set for the DECEMBER 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (KAC) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE by ISD Trenton, LLC regarding jurisdiction (Greyber, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendants' answer or response is due by April 29, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Abigail Carter and Adam Bellotti may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants New Jersey Education Association and New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan, with Attorney Robert McKee designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/12/2019. (JMF) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Adam Bellotti and Abigail Carter to appear pro hac vice by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Certification Special Admission Bellotti, #2 Exhibit Attorney Certificate Special Admission Carter)(McKee, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead and Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (McKee, Robert) Modified event type on 4/12/2019 (CTR). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/11/2019. (AC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE to counsel Abigail V. Carter and Adam Bellotti of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LSS) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to Removal (Jackson, D.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Continental Benefits, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to Removal (Jackson, D.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-825-T-30AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Circuit Court, case number 19-CA-2479 filed in State Court on 03/08/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15327241 filed by New Jersey Education Association, New Jersey Education Association Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKee, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.