This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:28:39 (UTC).

ISCO Industries, Inc. v. Grants Mill Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 ISCO Industries, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Grants Mill Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David J. Hale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00553

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISCO Industries, Inc.

Defendants

Grants Mill Company, Inc.

Michael T. Deason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Hart

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

Peter M. Cummins

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

Defendant Attorney

Bruce B. Paul

Attorney at McBrayer PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2400

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibt A - Employment Agreement (Redacted)

5 #5

Main Document

4 #6

Proposed Order

4 #5

Exhibit D - ISCO Alabama Complaint

4 #4

Exhibit C - ISCO Alabama Counterclaim

4 #3

Exhibit B - Deason Alabama Complaint

4 #2

Affidavit Declaration of Michael Deason

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Michael T. Deason, Grants Mill Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Paul, Bruce) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by ISCO Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement (Redacted)) (Cummins, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendants Michael T. Deason, Grants Mill Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Deason, #3 Exhibit B - Deason Alabama Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - ISCO Alabama Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit D - ISCO Alabama Complaint, #6 Proposed Order) (Paul, Bruce) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael T. Deason and Grants Mill Company, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-004580 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3415672). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File) (MNM) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISCO Industries, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce Benjamin Paul