This case was last updated from PACER on 03/01/2020 at 07:00:45 (UTC).

Isberner v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/01/2020 Isberner filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02001

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Isberner

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack D. McInnes

Attorney at McInnes Law LLC

1900 West 75Th Street, Suite 120

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Pamela Nagel Jorgensen

Attorney at McInnes Law, LLC

1900 West 75Th Street, Suite 120

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Defendant Attorney

Mark J. Goldsmith

Attorney at Baird Holm, LLP

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1500

Omaha, NE 68102-2068

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Deadline to submit Report of Parties Planning Meeting 3/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/13/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/13/2020. (aw) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/12/2020 for Defendant Walmart Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/29/2020. (ca) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Susan Isberner upon Walmart Inc. served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020 (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Susan Isberner. (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

#2

(#2) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Susan Isberner - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter

1 #1

Exhibit EEOC Charge

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5018762.), filed by Susan Isberner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter)(McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Deadline to submit Report of Parties Planning Meeting 3/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/13/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/13/2020. (aw) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/12/2020 for Defendant Walmart Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/29/2020. (ca) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Susan Isberner upon Walmart Inc. served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020 (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Susan Isberner. (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Susan Isberner - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5018762.), filed by Susan Isberner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter)(McInnes, Jack) (Entered: 01/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less