This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:20:32 (UTC).

Isakoff v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Isakoff filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07999

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Isakoff

Defendants

JUUL Labs Inc

Pax Labs Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikal C. Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

4 Dominion Dr Bld 3, Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to PAX Labs, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to JUUL Labs, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7538977.), filed by Joshua Isakoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, )(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00863. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Eastern, 4:19-cv-00863-SDJ, Isakoff v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al., Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-7999-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 14 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00863. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to the NORTHERN District of CALIFORNIA. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to PAX Labs, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to JUUL Labs, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7538977.), filed by Joshua Isakoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, )(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.