This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2021 at 09:34:31 (UTC).

Isaac v. Broadcast Music, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Isaac filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Broadcast Music, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr, Eli J. Richardson and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00579

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judges

William L. Campbell, Jr

Eli J. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monte Isaac

Defendants

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Round Hill Music LP

William Haynes

Cindy Haynes

Sunshade Music

Elizabeth Haynes

Nashville, TN 37203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher E. Hugan

Attorney at Hugan Law Office

Filmhouse Building, 810 Dominican Drive

Nashville, TN 37228

Defendant Attorneys

Keane A. Barger

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Timothy L. Warnock

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: An initial case management conference is scheduled in this case for Tuesday, October 5, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. Due to unforeseen circumstances, Magistrate Judge Holmes will not be able to conduct the initial case management conference. Magistrate Judge Holmes will, instead, enter the proposed initial case management order (the "ICMO"), with modifications to conform to the Court's preferred case management schedule. To monitor the progression of this case, Magistrate Judge Holmes will hold a subsequent status/case management conference as provided for in the ICMO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Monte Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment of royalties, #2 Exhibit Exclusive songwriting contract, #3 Exhibit BMI Letter of Direction, #4 Exhibit June 2012 Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit May 2015 Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit June 2015 Notice of Termination, #7 Exhibit Order appointing personal representative, #8 Exhibit June 2020 letter to BMI, #9 Exhibit January 2021 email to BMI, #10 Exhibit January 2021 letter to BMI, #11 Exhibit January 2021 letter to Round Hil, #12 Exhibit March 2021 letter to Round Hill, #13 Exhibit Certified mail receipts)(Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monte Isaac. William Haynes waiver sent on 8/12/2021. (Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monte Isaac. Cindy Haynes waiver sent on 8/12/2021. (Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock, Keane A. Barger admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Keane A. Barger on behalf of Cindy Haynes, William Haynes (Barger, Keane) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Warnock on behalf of Cindy Haynes, William Haynes (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS returned executed by Monte Isaac. Broadcast Music, Inc. served on 8/17/2021. (Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Campbell or the assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/6/2021. (ln) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Monte Isaac of counsel's current address (Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing by Monte Isaac Business Entity Disclosure (Hugan, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher E. Hugan admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Broadcast Music, Inc., Cindy Haynes, William Haynes, Round Hill Music LP, Sunshade Music. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Broadcast Music, Inc., Cindy Haynes, William Haynes, Round Hill Music LP, Sunshade Music (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3418275), filed by Monte Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assignment of Royalties, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exclusive Songwriting Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - BMI Letter of Direction, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 2012 Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit 5 - May 2015 Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 2015 Notice of Termination, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order appointing personal representative, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 2020 letter to BMI, #9 Exhibit 9 - January 2021 email to BMI, #10 Exhibit 10 - January 2021 letter to BMI, #11 Exhibit 11 - January 2021 letter to Round Hill, #12 Exhibit 12 - March 2021 letter to Round Hill, #13 Exhibit 13 - Certified Mail Receipts, #14 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Attachment 14 replaced on 7/28/2021) (mg). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Warnock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keane A. Barger