This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 09:24:23 (UTC).

Irving v. Schindler Elevator Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Irving filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schindler Elevator Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-09226

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fatima Irving

Defendant

Schindler Elevator Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian James Vannella

Attorney at Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

Woodside, NY 10005

Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld

Attorney at Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine G. Bryan

Attorney at Connell Foley LLP

1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Perri J. Koll

Attorney at Connell Foley LLP

1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) and Your Honor's November 1, 2022 Order. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Motions due by 8/21/2023. Deposition due by 5/6/2023. All Fact Discovery due by 6/5/2023. All Expert Discovery due by 7/22/2023. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. A Status Conference set for 8/7/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/06/2022) (ama) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#13

(#13) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#12

(#12) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Catherine G. Bryan dated November 29, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld on behalf of Fatima Irving..(Bromfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Fatima Irving.(Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian James Vannella on behalf of Fatima Irving..(Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Plaintiff Fatima Irving on November 2, 2022. Service was made by EMail. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Koll, Perri) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx, on October 28, 2022. Dkt. No. 5. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than November 11, 2022. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

5 #5

Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Notice of Removal

5 #4

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

5 #3

Exhibit C - Answer to Verified Complaint

5 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perri J. Koll on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Koll, Perri) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Schindler Holding, Ltd. for Schindler Elevator Corporation. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) and Your Honor's November 1, 2022 Order. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Motions due by 8/21/2023. Deposition due by 5/6/2023. All Fact Discovery due by 6/5/2023. All Expert Discovery due by 7/22/2023. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. A Status Conference set for 8/7/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/06/2022) (ama) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 12/6/2022. (Court Reporter present) (wv) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Catherine G. Bryan dated November 29, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld on behalf of Fatima Irving..(Bromfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Fatima Irving.(Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian James Vannella on behalf of Fatima Irving..(Vannella, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Plaintiff Fatima Irving on November 2, 2022. Service was made by EMail. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Koll, Perri) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx, on October 28, 2022. Dkt. No. 5. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than November 11, 2022. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Catherine G. Bryan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #5 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26882625, paid on 10/27/2022..(jgo) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 814927/2022..Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Notice of Removal).(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Catherine G. Bryan to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/2/2022. (jgo) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perri J. Koll on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Koll, Perri) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Schindler Holding, Ltd. for Schindler Elevator Corporation. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bryan, Catherine) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schindler Elevator Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perri J. Koll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine G. Bryan