This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2020 at 09:02:52 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Zieses Investment Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Zieses Investment Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis J. Liman and Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02872

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis J. Liman

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Susan B. Alswanger

Caryn Zieses

Barry Inger

Neil R. Zieses

Zieses Investment Partnership

Marshall Zieses

Debra S. Zieses

Allan Inger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas J. Cremona

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Davis Chaitman

Attorney at Chaitman LLP

465 Park Ave

New York, NY 10022

Philippe Marc Salomon

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP (NYC)

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Anthony Alexander Mingione

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP (NYC)

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nicholas J. Cremona dated May 27, 2020 re: Consent to Withdrawal of the Reference and Requesting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

1 #5

Proposed Order

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman

1 #1

Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support

#1

(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4669A, 08-1789A (SMB).Document filed by Zieses Investment Partnership, Barry Inger, Susan B. Alswanger, Caryn Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Allan Inger. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order).(bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nicholas J. Cremona dated May 27, 2020 re: Consent to Withdrawal of the Reference and Requesting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4669A, 08-1789A (SMB).Document filed by Zieses Investment Partnership, Barry Inger, Susan B. Alswanger, Caryn Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Allan Inger. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order).(bkar) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.