This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:44:46 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Realty et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Realty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Keenan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10109

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Keenan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Sage Realty

Martin A. Sage

Ann M. Sage Passer

Malcolm H. Sage

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seanna R. Brown

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal

David J. Sheehan

Nicholas J. Cremona

Stacey Ann Bell

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Bennett Kratenstein

Carole Neville

Darren Todd Azman

Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.

Jim Walden

Intervenor Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell

Kenneth J. Caputo

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck, I

 

Court Documents

76 #2

Exhibit 2-Judgment

76 #1

Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law

76 #76

Main Document

#75

(#75) PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26206642. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Document Number of Related Judgment: #70 ..(Hoang, Lan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#74

(#74) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #70 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26176861. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#73

(#73) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein, New Attorney: Jim Walden, Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10281, 212-335-2030. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

70 #1

Right to Appeal

70 #70

Main Document

#111

(#76) NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #67 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,,, #70 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26233749. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Exhibit 2-Judgment).(Vanderwal, Amy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (nd). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Proposed Order

#1

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #76 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Irving H. Picard were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #76 Notice of Cross Appeal,..(nd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #67 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,,, #70 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26233749. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Exhibit 2-Judgment).(Vanderwal, Amy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (nd). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED on May 27, 2022, in favor of Irving H. Picard in the amount of $3,370,000.00 against Sage Realty, Malcolm Sage, Martin Sage, and Ann Sage Passer,jointly and severally.. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party..(nd) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26206642. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Document Number of Related Judgment: #70 ..(Hoang, Lan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #74 Notice of Appeal filed by Malcolm H. Sage were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #74 Notice of Appeal. (tp) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #70 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26176861. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein, New Attorney: Jim Walden, Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10281, 212-335-2030. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jim Walden on behalf of Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-10057-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Andrew B. Kratenstein in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty. (bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-10057-AJN. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).Document filed by Sage Realty, Martin A. Sage, Malcolm H. Sage, Ann M. Sage Passer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bkar) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less