This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:23:28 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Associates et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Associates. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Keenan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10057

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Keenan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Ann M. Sage Passer

Martin A. Sage

Sage Associates

Malcolm H. Sage

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stacey Ann Bell

David J. Sheehan

Nicholas J. Cremona

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal

James Hefferan Rollinson

Lan Hoang

Patrick Thomas Campbell

Seanna R. Brown

Stephanie Ann Ackerman

Defendant Attorneys

Carole Neville

Andrew Bennett Kratenstein

Darren Todd Azman

Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.

Jim Walden

Intervenor Attorneys

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck, I

Kenneth J. Caputo

Kevin H. Bell

 

Court Documents

120 #2

Exhibit 2-Judgment

120 #1

Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law

120 #120

Main Document

#119

(#119) PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26206547. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Document Number of Related Judgment: #114 ..(Hoang, Lan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#118

(#118) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #114 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26176616. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#117

(#117) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein, New Attorney: Jim Walden, Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10281, 212-335-2030. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

114 #1

Right to Appeal

114 #114

Main Document

#111

(#120) NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #114 Clerk's Judgment,,,,, #111 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,,,. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26233672. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Exhibit 2-Judgment).(Vanderwal, Amy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (nd). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Proposed Order

#1

207 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #120 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Irving H. Picard were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #120 Notice of Cross Appeal,..(nd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #114 Clerk's Judgment,,,,, #111 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,,,. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26233672. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Exhibit 2-Judgment).(Vanderwal, Amy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (nd). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED on May 27, 2022, in favor of Irving H. Picard in the amount of $13,510,000.00 against Sage Associates, Malcolm Sage, Martin Sage, and Ann Sage Passer, jointly and severally.. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party..(nd) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26206547. Abstract of Judgment to be Picked up by the Party. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Document Number of Related Judgment: #114 ..(Hoang, Lan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #118 Notice of Appeal filed by Malcolm H. Sage were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #118 Notice of Appeal. (tp) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #114 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26176616. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein, New Attorney: Jim Walden, Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10281, 212-335-2030. Document filed by Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jim Walden on behalf of Malcolm H. Sage..(Walden, Jim) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Seanna R. Brown in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4362A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sage Associates Customer Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sage Associates Claim Determination Objection, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sage Realty Customer Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sage Realty Claim Determination Objection, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sage Associates 1S0004 Account Agreements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ex. 6 - Sage Associates 1S0547 Account Agreements, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sage Realty 1S0006 and 1S0316 Account Agreements).(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4362A, 08-1789 (SMB). . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seanna R. Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Associates..(Kratenstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Andrew B. Kratenstein in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4362A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4362A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Associates. (bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4362A, 08-1789 (SMB).Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Sage Associates, Martin A. Sage, Malcolm H. Sage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bkar) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less