This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:04:48 (UTC).

Irish v. Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Irish filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00958

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Irish

Defendants

Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc.

RadNet, Inc.

Radnet Management, Inc.

Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen Parker

Attorney at Parker Hanski LLC

40 Worth Street, Suite 602

New York, NY 07043

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Irish (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. RadNet, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Radnet Management, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Radnet Management, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. RadNet, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Irish. Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Irish (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Flushing Medical Arts Building Inc., Lenox Hill Radiology and Medical Imaging Associates, P.C., RadNet, Inc., Radnet Management, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15311425 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kelly Irish. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Parker, Glen) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RADNET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glen Howard Parker