This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 08:03:01 (UTC).

Irina Baghdishyan v. New York Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Irina Baghdishyan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against New York Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04160

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irina Baghdishyan

Defendants

New York Life Insurance Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina Whitney Kim

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Karen T Tsui

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorenson LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#12) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on July 9, 2021. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with Exhibit A attached ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Irina Baghdishyan, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #9 served on 5-27-2021. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/25/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (see order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company.(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 served on 05/20/2021. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, New York Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Irina Baghdishyan. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company, (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV14444 Receipt No: ACACDC-31319724 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Karen T Tsui added to party New York Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Brian Horrow