This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2020 at 08:06:22 (UTC).

IQVIA Inc. v. Khan et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 IQVIA Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Khan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03462

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IQVIA INC.

Defendants

VEEVA SYSTEMS INC.

MANSOOR KHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deborah Brand Baum

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Proctor May

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel and Frederick PLLC

1615 M St. Nw Ste. 400

Washington, DC 20036

Christopher D Baker

Attorney at Baker Curtis and Schwartz PC

One California St. Ste. 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steven F Benz

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick P.L.L.C.

1615 M St Nw Ste 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Attachment List of Court Admissions

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

3 #2

Summons to Veeva Sytems Inc. (originally filed as attachment to Complaint)

3 #1

Summons to Mansoor Khan (originally filed as attachment to Complaint)

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Baker. Directing attorney Christopher Baker to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rachel Proctor May. Directing attorney Rachel Proctor May to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Baker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8413661.) by Mansoor Khan, Veeva Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Court Admissions)(Benz, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel P. May (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8413627.) by Mansoor Khan, Veeva Systems Inc.(Benz, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by February 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/17/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings by Mansoor Khan, Veeva Systems Inc.(Benz, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F Benz on behalf of Mansoor Khan, Veeva Systems Inc. (Benz, Steven) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IQVIA Inc.. Veeva Systems Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019.(Baum, Deborah) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IQVIA Inc.. Mansoor Khan served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019.(Baum, Deborah) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Mansoor Khan and Veeva Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by IQVIA INC. re 1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Mansoor Khan (originally filed as attachment to Complaint), # 2 Summons to Veeva Sytems Inc. (originally filed as attachment to Complaint))(Baum, Deborah) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by IQVIA INC. identifying Corporate Parent IQVIA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ClinTec International Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate 159 Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate 159 Technology Solutions Private Ltd, Other Affiliate AECIO IT Solutions India Private Ltd., Other Affiliate Albatross Financial Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate ALIMED Egeszsegugyi Szolgaltato Kft., Other Affiliate APPATURE, INC., Other Affiliate Ardentia International Limited, Other Affiliate Ascott Sales Integration Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Asesorias IQVIA Solutions Chile Limitada, Other Affiliate Asserta Centroamerica Medicion de Mercados, S.A., Other Affiliate Battaerd Mansley (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate Battaerd Mansley Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Benefit Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Benefit Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate BioFortis, LLC, Other Affiliate BUZZEOPDMA LLC, Other Affiliate Cambridge Pharma Consultancy Limited, Other Affiliate Cambridge Pharma Consultancy, Inc., Other Affiliate Capionis SARL, Other Affiliate CDS - Center de Service SAS, Other Affiliate Cegedim Venezuela C.A., Other Affiliate Cenduit (India) Services Private Company Limited, Other Affiliate Cenduit Limtied, Other Affiliate Cenduit LLC, Other Affiliate Cenduit Mauritius Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Clinical Financial Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Clinical Insorcing Solutions S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Clinical Lab Minority Shareholder Limited, Other Affiliate ClinTec Austria GmbH, Other Affiliate ClinTec Egypt LLC, Other Affiliate ClinTec Gesellschaft fur Klinische Entwicklung GmbH, Other Affiliate ClinTec International (Pty) Ltd., Other Affiliate ClinTec International (Thailand) Limited, Other Affiliate ClinTec International AG, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Belgium BVBA, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Bulgaria OOD, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate ClinTec International Denmark ApS, Other Affiliate ClinTec International doo, Other Affiliate ClinTec International FZ-LLC, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Hungary Kft, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Inc., Other Affiliate ClinTec International Italy S.r.l., Other Affiliate ClinTec international K.K., Other Affiliate ClinTec International Limited, Other Affiliate ClinTec International LLC, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Ltd, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Ltd, UK, Filial Sverige, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Ltd., Other Affiliate ClinTec International Norway AS, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Off-Shore S.A.L., Other Affiliate ClinTec International OY, Other Affiliate Clintec International Pharmaceutical Services Ltd., Other Affiliate ClinTec International Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Romania S.R.L., Other Affiliate ClinTec International RUS LLC, Other Affiliate ClinTec International s.r.o., Other Affiliate ClinTec International SARL, Other Affiliate ClinTec International Services Inc., Other Affiliate ClinTec International SL, Other Affiliate ClinTec International sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate ClinTec Luxembourg S.A., Other Affiliate ClinTec Turkey Medikal ve Farmasotik Hizmetler Ticaret Limited Sirketi, Other Affiliate CinTech Ireland International Research Limited, Other Affiliate CRM Health Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate CSD Health Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate CT Clinical Portual Unipessoal LDA, Other Affiliate CT Clinical Services EOOD, Other Affiliate CT Consulting Inc., Other Affiliate Data Niche Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Dataline Software Limited, Other Affiliate Datandina Ecuador S.A., Other Affiliate Datec Industria e Comercio, Distribudora Grafica e Mala Direta Ltda., Other Affiliate Dimensions Healthcare LLC, Other Affiliate Drug Dev Inc., Other Affiliate DrugDev Limited, Other Affiliate EA Institute L.L.C., Other Affiliate Enterprise Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Epernicus, LLC, Other Affiliate EPS Research Limited, Other Affiliate EPS Software Limited, Other Affiliate Exepi SAS, Other Affiliate Forcea NV, Other Affiliate Foresight Group International UK LTD, Other Affiliate foresight Group Japan G.K., Other Affiliate Foresight IT Solutions Consulting India Private Limited, Other Affiliate GCE Clin Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate GCE Global Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate GCE Solutions B.V., Other Affiliate GCE Solutions GmbH, Other Affiliate GCE Solutions Inc., Other Affiliate GCE Solutions International, LLC, Other Affiliate GCE Solutions US, LLC, Other Affiliate GCE Solutions, GmbH, Other Affiliate GCE Solutions, P.L., Other Affiliate GCE Solutions, S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Global Crown Investment Limited, Other Affiliate Grace Data Corporation, Other Affiliate Gunjan Cutting Edge Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Health Practices Research Institute, LLC, Other Affiliate Highpoint Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Hospital Marketing Services Ltd., Other Affiliate Hotel Lot C-8B, LLC, Other Affiliate Lasist Holdco Limited, Other Affiliate Lasist Portugal, Consultadoria na Area de Saude, Unipessoal, Lta, Other Affiliate Lasist Sau Agencia en Chile, Other Affiliate Lasist Sociedad Anonima Unipersonal, Other Affiliate iGuard, Inc., Other Affiliate Impact RX, LLC, Other Affiliate IMS Health Korea Ltd, Other Affiliate IMS (UK) Pension Plan Trustee Company Limited, Other Affiliate IMS AB, Other Affiliate IMS Health (Australia) Partnership, Other Affiliate IMS Health Bangladesh Limtied, Other Affiliate IMS Health de Venezuela C.A., Other Affiliate IMS Health Egypt Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Group Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Information Solutions Australia Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate IMS Health Information Solutions India Private Ltd., Other Affiliate IMS Health Lanka (Private) Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Networks Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Pakistan (Private) Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Paraguay SRL, Other Affiliate IMS Health Puerto Rico Inc., Other Affiliate IMS Health Surveys Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions (China) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions Holdings AB, Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions Hungary Ltd., Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions Kazakhstan, LLC, Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology Solutions Sweden AB, Other Affiliate IMS Health Technology TUNISIA, Other Affiliate IMS Health Tunisia sari, Other Affiliate IMS Health Uruguay S.A., Other Affiliate IMS Holdings (U.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Hospital Group Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Information Solutions Medical Research Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Information Solutions UK Ltd., Other Affiliate IMS International (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Market Research Consult (Beijing), Other Affiliate IMS Meridian Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Meridian Research Limited, Other Affiliate IMS Software Services Ltd., Other Affiliate IMS Technology Solutions UK Limited, Other Affiliate Infocus Health Limited, Other Affiliate Infopharm Ltd., Other Affiliate Innovex Holdings I LLC, Other Affiliate Innovex Merger Corp., Other Affiliate Innovex Saglik Hizmetleri Arastirma ve Danismanlik Ticaret Limited Sirketi, Other Affiliate Innovex Saglik Urunleri Pazarlame ve Hizmet Danismanlik Anonim Sirketi, Other Affiliate Institute of Medical Communications, Other Affiliate INTERCONTINENTAL MEDICAL STATISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (DE), Other Affiliate Interstatistik AG, Other Affiliate IPP Informacion Promocional y Publicitaria S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate IQVA Romania S.R.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA Medical Development (Dalian) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA SOLUTIONS PHILIPPINES, INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA (Thailand) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA AB, Other Affiliate IQVIA Adriatic d.o.o. za Konzalting, Other Affiliate IQVIA AG, Other Affiliate IQVIA AG (Mexico Branch), Other Affiliate IQVIA AG (UK Branch), Other Affiliate IQVIA Asia Pacific Commercial Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Beteiligungs-gesellschaft mbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA BioSciences Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Biotech LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA CHINAMETRIK INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA Clinical AB, Other Affiliate IQVIA Clinical, Filial af IQVIA Clinical APDenmark, Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial Consulting Sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial GmbH & Co. OHG, Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial I LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA COMMERCIAL TRADING CORP., Other Affiliate IQVIA COMMERCIAL INDIA HOLDINGS CORP., Other Affiliate IQVIA COMMERCIAL SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial Software GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA Commercial Sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA Consulting and Information Services India Private Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Consulting Solutions bvba, Other Affiliate IQVIA CSMS US Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA Finance Ireland Designated Activity Company, Other Affiliate IQVIA GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA Healthcare QFC branch, Other Affiliate IQVIA Hellas Technology Solutions S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA Holdings France SAS, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Brasil Ltda., Other Affiliate IQVIA IES DenmarkApS, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Europe Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES European Holdings, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Italia S.r.l., Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Overseas Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES OY, Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Portugal Unipressoal Ltda., Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Portugal, Unipessoal Lda., Other Affiliate IQVIA IES Puerto Rico Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA II Technology Solutions Portugal, Unipessoal LDA, Other Affiliate IQVIA Inc. - Thailand Branch, Other Affiliate IQVIA INFORMATION MEDICAL STATISTICS (ISRAEL) LTD., Other Affiliate IQVIA Information Solutions (China) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Information Solutions GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA Information, S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA Informations Solutions France SAS, Other Affiliate IQVIA Istanbul Saglik Hizmetler Arastirma ve Danismanlik Limited Sirketi, Other Affiliate IQVIA Korea Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Lebanon S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA LTD, Other Affiliate IQVIA MARKET INTELLIGENCE LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Marktforschung GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA Maroc SARL, Other Affiliate IQVIA Mauritius Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA Medical Communications & Consulting, Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA Medical Education Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA Medical Radar AB, Other Affiliate IQVIA Operations France SAS, Other Affiliate IQVIA Partners AS, Other Affiliate IQVIA PHARMA Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA Pharma Services Corp., Other Affiliate IQVIA Pharmaceutical Marketing Services Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Phase One Services LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS (India) Private Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS (Pty.) Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS AG, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS and Integrated Services Belgium NV, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Argentina S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Asia Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Austria GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Brasil Ltda., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS BT Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Bulgaria EOOD, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Canada ULC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Chile, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Colombia S.A.S., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Costa Rica, S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Czech Republic, s.r.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS d.o.o. Beograd, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS East Asia Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Eastern Holdings GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Egypt LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS ESTONIA OU, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Finland OY, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS France SAS (formerly, Quintiles Benefit France SNC), Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Funding LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Guatemala S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS HELLAS Single Member Societe Anonyme, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Holdings, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Ireland (Finance) Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Ireland Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS ISRAEL LTD., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Italy Srl, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Latin America LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Latvia SIA, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Magyarorszag Gyogyszerfejlesztesi es Tanacsado Kft., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Malaysia Sdn. Bhd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Moscow, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Netherlands BV, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Novosibirsk, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Panama Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Peru S.r.l., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Philippines Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Poland Sp. Zoo, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Pty. Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Pty. Ltd. (New Zealand Branch), Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Slovakia s.r.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Spain S.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Spain, S.L., Representacao, Permanente em Portugal, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS St. Petersburg, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Switzerland sarl, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Taiwan Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Transfer LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS UAB, Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS UK Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA RDS Vietnam Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate IQVIA Services Japan K.K., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solues de Tecnologia do Brasil Ltda, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions (NZ) Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions (Pty.) Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions a.s., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Argentina S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA SOLUTIONS ASIA PTE. LTD., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Australia Holdings Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions B.V., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Belgium S.P.R.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Bolivia S.R.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Bulgaria EOOD, Other Affiliate IQVIA SOLUTIONS CANADA INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Colombia S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Consulting Myanmar Company Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions del Peru S.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Denmark AS, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions do Brasil Ltda., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Enterprise Management Consulting (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finance B.V., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finance UK I Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finance UK II Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finance UK III Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finance UK V Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Finland OY, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Global Holdings UK Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions GmbH, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Holdings (Pty.) Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions HQ Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Italy S.r.l., Other Affiliate IQVIA SOLUTIONS JAPAN K.K., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Kazakhstan LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Malaysia Sdn. Bhd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Norway AS, Other Affiliate IQVIA SOLUTIONS OPERATIONS CENTER PHLIPPINES INC., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Pharmaceutical SRL, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Portugal, Lda., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Regional Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Republica Dominicana, S.R.L., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions s.r.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Saudi Arabia Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Services Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions Sweden AB, Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions TAIWAN LTD., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions UK Investments Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Solutions UK Limited, Other Affiliate IQVIA Staff Services Sp.A., Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology and Services AG, Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Services Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Colombia Ltda., Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Egypt LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Finland OY, Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Poland SP. z.o.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Romania Srl, Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions s.r.o., Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions S.R.O. Branch Bulgaria, Other Affiliate IQVIA Technology Solutions Ukraine LLC, Other Affiliate IQVIA Tibbi Istatistik Ticaret ve Musavirlik Ltd. Sirketi, Other Affiliate IQVIA Trading Management Inc., Other Affiliate IQVIA TRANSPORTATION SERVICES CORP., Other Affiliate IQVIA World Publications Ltd., Other Affiliate IQVIA Zagreb d.o.o., Other Affiliate Kun Tai Medical Development Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate Kun Tuo Medical Research & Development (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Laboratorio Commuq Pharma SL, Other Affiliate Linguamatics Limited, Other Affiliate Linguamatics Solutions Incorporated, Other Affiliate Linguamatics Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate M&H Informatics (BD) LTD., Other Affiliate Mecurial Insights Holding Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate Mecurial Insights Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate MED-VANTAGE, INC., Other Affiliate Mercados Y Analisis, S.A., Other Affiliate Meridian Research Vietnam Ltd., Other Affiliate Nordisk Medicin Information AB, Other Affiliate Novasyte, LLC, Other Affiliate Novella Clinical Ltd., Other Affiliate Novex Pharma Gmbh, Other Affiliate Novex Pharma Laboratorio S.L., Other Affiliate Novex Pharma Limited, Other Affiliate Nuevo Health Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Onkodatamed GmbH, Other Affiliate Operaciones Centralizadas Latinoamericana Limitada, Other Affiliate Optimum Contact Limited, Other Affiliate Penderwood Limited, Other Affiliate Pharma Deals Limited, Other Affiliate Pharma Strategy Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Pharmadata s.r.o., Other Affiliate Pharmaforce, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate PharmARC Consulting Services GmbH, Other Affiliate PharmARC Inc., Other Affiliate Pilgrim Quality Solutions EMEA BV, Other Affiliate Pilgrim Software Asia PVT, Ltd, Other Affiliate PILGRIM SOFTWARE HOLDING B.V., Other Affiliate POLARIS MANAGEMENT PARTNERS LLC, Other Affiliate Polaris Solutions BV, Other Affiliate Polaris Solutions Ltd., Other Affiliate POLARIS SOLUTIONS, LLC, Other Affiliate PR Editions S.A.S., Other Affiliate Primeum IQVIA SAS, Other Affiliate Privacy Analytics Inc., Other Affiliate Professional Pharmaceutical Marketing Services (Pty.) Ltd., Other Affiliate PT IMS Health Indonesia, Other Affiliate PT Quintiles Indonesia, Other Affiliate Pygargus AB, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions (India) Private Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions (Quest) Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions (Quest) LLC, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions B.V., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions BioSciences LLC, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions China (Quest) Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions China Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Expression Analysis LLC, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions K.K., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Proprietary Limited, Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Q Squared Solutions S.A., Other Affiliate Qcare Site Services, Inc., Other Affiliate QIMS Pharma Services SA DE CV, Other Affiliate Quintiles Benin Ltd., Other Affiliate Quintiles Clindata (Pty.) Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Clindepharm (Pty.) Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Clinical and Commercial Nigeria Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Commercial Germany GmbH, Other Affiliate Quintiles Commercial Rus LLC, Other Affiliate Quintiles Commercial South Africa (Pty) Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles East Africa Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Finance Sarl, Other Affiliate Quintiles Finance Uruguay, S.r.l., Other Affiliate Quintiles GmbH, Other Affiliate Quintiles Holdings S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Quintiles IMS European Holdings C.V., Other Affiliate Quintiles Lanka Private Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Latin America Inc., Other Affiliate Quintiles Luxembourg European Holding, S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Quintiles Luxembourg France Holdings SARL, Other Affiliate Quintiles Medical Development (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate QUINTILES MEXICO, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., Other Affiliate Quintiles Netherlands, Other Affiliate Quintiles Norway, Other Affiliate Quintiles Phase One Clinical Trials India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Russia LLC, Other Affiliate Quintiles S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Quintiles Site Services, S.A., Other Affiliate Quintiles South Africa (PTY.) Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles UK (Japan Holdings) Limited, Other Affiliate Quintiles Ukraine, Other Affiliate Quintiles West Africa Limited, Other Affiliate Radar Acquisition Blocker, Inc., Other Affiliate Redsite Limited, Other Affiliate Reportive SA, Other Affiliate RIVERMARK, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Other Affiliate RX India LLC, Other Affiliate Schwarzeck Verlag GmbH, Other Affiliate Secureconsent, LLC, Other Affiliate Shanghai IMS Market Research Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Source Informatics Limited, Other Affiliate SPARTAN LEASING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate Statfinn Oy, Other Affiliate STI Technologies Limited, Other Affiliate Strategique Sante, Other Affiliate Targeted Molecular Diagnostics, LLC, Other Affiliate Tarius A/S, Other Affiliate Temas Srl - Societ Unipersonale, Other Affiliate TforG Connect BVBA, Other Affiliate TforG Support NV, Other Affiliate THE AMUNDSEN GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate Themis Limited, Other Affiliate UAB IQVIA Commercial, Other Affiliate VALUECENTRIC GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH, Other Affiliate VALUEMEDICS RESEARCH, LLC, Other Affiliate VCG&A Inc., Other Affiliate VCG-Bio, Inc., Other Affiliate Vivacity Health Pty. Ltd. for IQVIA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Baum, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8384149.), filed by IQVIA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint)(Baum, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VEEVA SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IQVIA, Inc. is a litigant