This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2020 at 09:39:34 (UTC).

IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG v. Verizon Communications Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 IPCom Gmbh Co KG filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Verizon Communications Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG

Defendants

Verizon Services Corp

Verizon Business Network Services Inc

Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC

Verizon Business Global, LLC

Verizon Communications Inc

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc

Verizon Data Services LLC

Verizon Business Network Services, LLC

Verizon Online LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Franklin Dewberry

Attorney at Dechert LLP - Austin

300 W 6Th Street, Suite 2010

Austin, TX 78701

Jeffrey Brian Plies

Attorney at Dechert LLP - Austin

300 W 6Th Street, Suite 2010

Austin, TX 78701

Martin Jay Black

Attorney at Dechert LLP - Philadelphia

2929 Arch St, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Kyle Randall Akin

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of All Defendants (Akin, Kyle) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#18

(#18) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of All Defendants (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Services Corp served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Online LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Data Services LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Brian Plies on behalf of IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG identifying Other Affiliate IPCom Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Karols Development Co., LLC for IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8031968.), filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Online LLC to 12/21/2020; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Global, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Communications Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Network Services, LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Business Network Services Inc to 12/21/2020; Verizon Data Services LLC to 12/21/2020; Verizon Services Corp to 12/21/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of All Defendants (Akin, Kyle) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Online LLC to 12/4/2020; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Global, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Communications Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Network Services, LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Business Network Services Inc to 12/4/2020; Verizon Data Services LLC to 12/4/2020; Verizon Services Corp to 12/4/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of All Defendants (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Services Corp served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Online LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Data Services LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. Verizon Communications Inc served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Global, LLC c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Network Services Inc c/o Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Company, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Communications Inc c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Data Services LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Online LLC c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System, Verizon Services Corp. c/o Registered Agent C T Corporation System (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Verizon Business Global, LLC, #2 Summons(es) Verizon Business Network Services Inc., #3 Summons(es) Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, #4 Summons(es) Verizon Communications Inc., #5 Summons(es) Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., #6 Summons(es) Verizon Data Services LLC, #7 Summons(es) Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, #8 Summons(es) Verizon Online LLC, #9 Summons(es) Verizon Services Corp.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Franklin Dewberry on behalf of IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG (Dewberry, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Brian Plies on behalf of IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG identifying Other Affiliate IPCom Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Karols Development Co., LLC for IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Online LLC, Verizon Services Corp ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8031968.), filed by IPCom Gmbh & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Martin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon Services Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc is a litigant