This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:17:30 (UTC).

IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC v. Berchen

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Berchen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Kimberly Berchen

3Rd Party Defendant

Team Health, LLC doing business as TeamHealth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Paul Fryer

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

6000 Fairview Road, Suite 1415

Charlotte, NC 28210

Matthew J. Gilley

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

100 Dunbar Street, Suite 300

Spartanburg, SC 29306

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Tamara L. Huckert

Attorney at Strianese Huckert, LLP

3501 Monroe Rd.

Charlotte, NC 28205

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Team Health, LLC (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Third-Party Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal (see Attachment #1, pgs. 33-50), by Team Health, LLC.(Fryer, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (ejb). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Berchen. Team Health, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Huckert, Tamara) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Counterclaim contained in #1 Notice of Removal (see Attachment #1, pgs. 33-50), by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC.(Fryer, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (rhf). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically re: Third Party Complaint as to Team Health, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) Modified text on 4/10/2021 (ejb). (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Gilley on behalf of IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC (Gilley, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A: Pleadings Filed in the Superior Court of Buncombe County, Case No. 21

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-00098. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4944741), filed by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pleadings Filed in the Superior Court of Buncombe County, Case No. 21-CVS-00098, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Counsel for the parties shall call into the conference line five minutes prior to the conference. Clerk will contact parties with call-in information. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/12/2021. (ejb) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Team Health, LLC (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Third-Party Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal (see Attachment #1, pgs. 33-50), by Team Health, LLC.(Fryer, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (ejb). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Berchen. Team Health, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Huckert, Tamara) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Counterclaim contained in #1 Notice of Removal (see Attachment #1, pgs. 33-50), by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC.(Fryer, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (rhf). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically re: Third Party Complaint as to Team Health, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) Modified text on 4/10/2021 (ejb). (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Gilley on behalf of IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC (Gilley, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-00098. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4944741), filed by IPC The Hospitalist Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pleadings Filed in the Superior Court of Buncombe County, Case No. 21-CVS-00098, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IPC Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Team Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Paul Fryer