This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 08:24:48 (UTC).

Iowa Regional Utilities Association v. City of Pella, Iowa

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Iowa Regional Utilities Association filed an Other lawsuit against City of Pella, Iowa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Wolle and Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00310

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Wolle

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iowa Regional Utilities Association

Defendant

City of Pella, Iowa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen H. Locher

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Joseph H. Lubben

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Frank Murray Smith

Attorney at FRANK SMITH LAW OFFICE

4215 Hubbell Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50317

Michael Dwight Davis

Attorney at DOYLE HARRIS DAVIS & HAUGHEY

2419 East Skelly Drive

Tulsa, OK 74105

Steven Massey Harris

Attorney at DOYLE HARRIS DAVIS & HAUGHEY

2419 East Skelly Drive

Tulsa, OK 74105

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Russell Erickson

Attorney at BRADSHAW FOWLER PROCTOR & FAIRGRAVE, P.C.

801 Grand Ave, Suite 3700

Des Moines, IA 50309

Jason C. Palmer

Attorney at BRADSHAW FOWLER PROCTOR & FAIRGRAVE, P.C.

801 Grand Ave, Suite 3700

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 12/4/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/14/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/14/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/12/2021. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/26/2021. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 3/19/2021. Discovery Deadline 4/9/2021. Jury Trial, Final Pretrial Conference, and dispositive motion deadline to be set under separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#13

(#13) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Iowa Regional Utilities Association.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Pella, Iowa.(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#10

(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue hearing without date. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/21/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#9

(#9) Unresisted MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Iowa Regional Utilities Association.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/3/2020. (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4274794 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. (Harris, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4274771 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. (Davis, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#5

(#5) TEXT ORDER. Hearing on plaintiff's request for temporary injunctive relief will be held by telephone conference call at 1:00 p.m. on 10/22/20. To join the call, counsel shall dial 1-888-636-3807, using the access code: 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/15/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Russell Erickson on behalf of City of Pella, Iowa (Erickson, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Palmer on behalf of City of Pella, Iowa (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against City of Pella, Iowa Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4268016., filed by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/5/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 12/4/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/14/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/14/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/12/2021. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/26/2021. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 3/19/2021. Discovery Deadline 4/9/2021. Jury Trial, Final Pretrial Conference, and dispositive motion deadline to be set under separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#16) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2020. Attorneys Michael Davis, Stephen Locher & Frank Smith appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Jason Palmer appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 16 minutes. (jeb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Three-Day Extension of Deadline to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. The parties shall have until noon on November 12, 2020 to file their proposed scheduling order and discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/10/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Iowa Regional Utilities Association.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULNG CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 12, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 9, 2020. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/30/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Pella, Iowa.(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue hearing without date. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/21/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unresisted MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Iowa Regional Utilities Association.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/3/2020. (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Dwight Davis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Massey Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/15/2020. (slg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4274794 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. (Harris, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4274771 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. (Davis, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: motion hearing set for 10/22/2020 at 01:00 PM by phone hearing before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. See order for particulars. (alb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER. Hearing on plaintiff's request for temporary injunctive relief will be held by telephone conference call at 1:00 p.m. on 10/22/20. To join the call, counsel shall dial 1-888-636-3807, using the access code: 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/15/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Russell Erickson on behalf of City of Pella, Iowa (Erickson, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Palmer on behalf of City of Pella, Iowa (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against City of Pella, Iowa Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4268016., filed by Iowa Regional Utilities Association. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/5/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less