Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 08:54:48 (UTC).

Iowa Network Services Inc. v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Iowa Network Services Inc filed an Other lawsuit against CenturyLink Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr, James E. Gritzner and Ross A Walters(R). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Gritzner

Referral Judges

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Ross A Walters(R)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iowa Network Services Inc.

Defendants

Level 3 Communications, LLC

Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc.

WilTel Communications, LLC

MCI Communications Services Inc.

CenturyLink Communications, LLC

Verizon Select Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis L. Puckett

Attorney at SULLIVAN & WARD PC

6601 Westown Parkway, Suite 200

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Tony S. Lee

Attorney at FLETCHER, HEALD AND HILDRETH, P.L.C.

1300 17Th Street North, 11Th Floor

Arlington, VA 22209

James U. Troup

Attorney at FLETCHER, HEALD AND HILDRETH, P.L.C.

1300 17Th Street North, 11Th Floor

Arlington, VA 22209

Defendant Attorneys

Charles W. Steese

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP (CO)

4643 S. Ulster Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Douglas N. Marsh

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP (CO)

4643 S. Ulster Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4237749 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC. (Marsh, Douglas) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC. (Steese, Charles) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W Steese on behalf of CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC (Steese, Charles) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.; CenturyLink Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Level 3 Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; WilTel Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.; MCI Communications Services Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Verizon Select Services, Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4215357 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4215340 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Troup, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Errata re #1 Complaint, filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4205452., filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/29/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas N. Marsh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 9/4/2020. (kjw) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4237749 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC. (Marsh, Douglas) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC. (Steese, Charles) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W Steese on behalf of CenturyLink Communications, LLC, Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, WilTel Communications, LLC (Steese, Charles) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.; CenturyLink Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Level 3 Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; WilTel Communications, LLC waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.; MCI Communications Services Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Verizon Select Services, Inc. waiver served on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James U. Troup; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tony S. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 8/12/2020. (slg) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4215357 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Lee, Tony) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4215340 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Troup, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (kjw) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Errata re #1 Complaint, filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4205452., filed by Iowa Network Services Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/29/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Puckett, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Crossing Telecommunications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Select Services Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wiltel Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant