This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:18:53 (UTC).

IOU CENTRAL INC v. VOLTATA TP ACQUISITION LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 IOU CENTRAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLTATA TP ACQUISITION LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05478

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IOU Central, Inc.

Defendants

VOLTATA LLC

PAUL REID SIGLINGER

VOLTATA TP ACQUISITION LLC

CLIFTON M MITCHELL

JPFI LLC

JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER

JP Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Gerard Wersant

Attorney at Paul G. Wersant Attorney At Law

Suite D-245, 3245 Peachtree Parkway

Suwanee, GA 30024

Defendant Attorneys

Gene A. Major

Attorney at Fain Major & Brennan

100 Glenridge Point Parkway, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30342-1445

Richard Ward Brown

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

Suite 500, 100 Glenridge Point Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30342

Brendan H. Parnell

Attorney at Quirk & Quirk, LLC

300 Century Springs West, 6000 Lake Forrest Drive Nw

Atlanta, GA 30328

Colleen Quirk Johnston

Attorney at Quirk & Quirk, LLC

Suite 300, Century Springs West, 6000 Lake Forest Dr., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Summons JPFI, LLC

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Julie Siglinger

1 #5

Summons Clifton Mitchell

1 #2

Summons Voltata LLC

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3274403, $400 filed by IOU CENTRAL INC (Attachments: #1 Summons Voltata TP, #2 Summons Voltata LLC, #3 Summons Paul Siglinger, #4 Summons Julie Siglinger, #5 Summons Clifton Mitchell, #6 Summons JPFI, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #1

Summons Voltata TP

1 #3

Summons Paul Siglinger

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IOU CENTRAL INC identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU CENTRAL INC. (Wersant, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#41

(#41) RESPONSE re #40 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Improper Reply #38 and Improper and Untimely Affidavits #38 #39 filed by JPFI LLC, JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER. (Parnell, Brendan) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

38 #1

Affidavit of Julie Johncox Siglinger

#39

(#39) NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Julie Johncox Siglinger by JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER re #38 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Parnell, Brendan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#38

(#38) REPLY Brief in Support of #26 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Julie Johncox Siglinger and JPFI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Julie Johncox Siglinger)(Parnell, Brendan) Modified on 1/21/2020 to edit event text (jap). Modified on 1/22/2020 to add filer and edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#40

(#40) MOTION to Strike or Disregard Improper Reply #38 and Improper and Untimely Affidavits #38 #39 and for Related Relief with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc. (Wersant, Paul) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

26 #3

Exhibit B - Guaranty - PRS

#26

(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

26 #2

Exhibit A - Promissory Note - PRS

26 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE re #40 MOTION to Strike or Disregard Improper Reply #38 and Improper and Untimely Affidavits #38 #39 filed by JPFI LLC, JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER. (Parnell, Brendan) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION to Strike or Disregard Improper Reply #38 and Improper and Untimely Affidavits #38 #39 and for Related Relief with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc. (Wersant, Paul) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Julie Johncox Siglinger by JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER re #38 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Parnell, Brendan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #26 Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) REPLY Brief in Support of #26 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Julie Johncox Siglinger and JPFI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Julie Johncox Siglinger)(Parnell, Brendan) Modified on 1/21/2020 to edit event text (jap). Modified on 1/22/2020 to add filer and edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss [Doc 34] and Related Relief filed by Julie Johncox Siglinger and JPFI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brendan H. Parnell, Esq.)(Parnell, Brendan) Modified on 1/21/2020 to add filer and edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Gene A. Major on behalf of CLIFTON M MITCHELL (Major, Gene) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss [Doc 34] and Related Relief with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Text of Proposed Order)(Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by CLIFTON M MITCHELL. Discovery ends on 5/26/2020.(Brown, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER re: #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, AND IMPROPER PROCESS AND SERVICE OF PROCESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Guaranty, #3 Exhibit Service Documents)(PARNELL, BRENDAN) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JPFI LLC re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, AND IMPROPER PROCESS AND SERVICE OF PROCESS, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, AND IMPROPER PROCESS AND SERVICE OF PROCESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Guaranty, #3 Exhibit Service Documents)(PARNELL, BRENDAN) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, AND IMPROPER PROCESS AND SERVICE OF PROCESS by JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER filed by BRENDAN H PARNELL.(PARNELL, BRENDAN) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, AND IMPROPER PROCESS AND SERVICE OF PROCESS by JPFI LLC and JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER filed by BRENDAN H PARNELL.(PARNELL, BRENDAN) Modified to add JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER as a filer on 10/29/2019 (ans). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CLERK'S DECISION RE: E-Filing for CLIFTON M MITCHELL. Request to E-File is GRANTED. You must register to E-File via PACER.gov. (dwb) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to IOU CENTRAL INC (ans) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons VOLTATA LLC, #2 Summons PAUL REID SIGLINGER, #3 Summons JULIE JOHNCOX SIGLINGER, #4 Summons CLIFTON MITCHELL, #5 Summons JPFI LLC)(ans) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Jurisdictional Statement by IOU CENTRAL INC (Wersant, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IOU CENTRAL INC identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU CENTRAL INC. (Wersant, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3274403, $400 filed by IOU CENTRAL INC (Attachments: #1 Summons Voltata TP, #2 Summons Voltata LLC, #3 Summons Paul Siglinger, #4 Summons Julie Siglinger, #5 Summons Clifton Mitchell, #6 Summons JPFI, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.