This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:23:02 (UTC).

IOU Central, Inc. v. License Express Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 IOU Central, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against License Express Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05470

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IOU Central, Inc.

Defendants

Judith Pabor Blankenship

Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC

License Express Inc.

Judith L. Blankenship

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Gerard Wersant

Attorney at Paul G. Wersant Attorney At Law

Suite D-245, 3245 Peachtree Parkway

Suwanee, GA 30024

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Harris Surden

Attorney at Hartman Simons & Wood

6400 Powers Ferry Road Nw, Suite 400, 30339

Atlanta, GA 30328

Kristen A. Yadlosky

Attorney at Hartman Simons & Wood LLP

6400 Powers Ferry Road, N.W., Suite 400

Atlanta, GA 30339

John Thomas Rouse

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 702

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc.(Surden, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc. (Surden, Todd) Modified on 1/23/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#14

(#14) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS). (jap) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IOU Central, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by IOU Central, Inc. for Defendant MERS (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against, Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) filed by IOU Central, Inc..(Wersant, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by License Express Inc..(Surden, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the alternative open default by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Surden, Todd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Judith Pabor Blankenship served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. License Express Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Judith Pabor Blankenship.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/26/2020.(Rouse, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to License Express Inc., Judith Pabor Blankenship, and Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Judith Blankenship, #2 Summons Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC) (jap) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by IOU Central, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9146519). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the alternative open default, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc.(Surden, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Judith Pabor Blankenship and License Express Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc. (Surden, Todd) Modified on 1/23/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS). (jap) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #13 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by IOU Central, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU Central, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IOU Central, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IOU CENTRAL INC - Canada for IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by IOU Central, Inc. for Defendant MERS (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against, Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) filed by IOU Central, Inc..(Wersant, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by License Express Inc..(Surden, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the alternative open default by Judith Pabor Blankenship, License Express Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Surden, Todd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Judith Pabor Blankenship served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. License Express Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wersant, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Judith Pabor Blankenship.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/26/2020.(Rouse, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to License Express Inc., Judith Pabor Blankenship, and Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Judith Blankenship, #2 Summons Interlinc Mortgage Services, LLC) (jap) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by IOU Central, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9146519). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.