This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:25:54 (UTC).

Invincible IP, LLC v. Nutanix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Invincible IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nutanix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00955

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Invincible IP, LLC

Defendant

Nutanix, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Defendant Attorney

Philip A. Rovner

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Nutanix, Inc. answer due 10/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2021. (nms) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 1, 2021 - filed by Nutanix, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP, LLC. Nutanix, Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00954-RGA, 1:21-cv-00955-RGA, 1:21-cv-00956-RGA, 1:21-cv-00959-RGA, 1:21-cv-00960-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,938,634; 9,635,134; 9,678,774. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nutanix, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647379.) - filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less