This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2021 at 07:50:09 (UTC).

Invincible IP, LLC v. LifeRay Cloud, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Invincible IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LifeRay Cloud, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01226

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Invincible IP, LLC

Defendant

LifeRay Cloud, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (*Reset Answer Deadlines: LifeRay Cloud, Inc. answer due 10/30/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2021. (nms) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP, LLC. LifeRay Cloud, Inc. served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01224-RGA, 1:21-cv-01226-RGA, 1:21-cv-01227-RGA, 1:21-cv-01228-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LifeRay Cloud, Inc. on 8/26/2021. (twk) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,635,134. (twk) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against LifeRay Cloud, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3686927.) - filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Invincible IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin