This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:26:26 (UTC).

Invincible IP LLC v. DigitalOcean, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Invincible IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DigitalOcean, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Invincible IP LLC

Defendant

DigitalOcean, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorneys

Arthur G. Connolly, III

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kelly M. Conlan

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Conlan on behalf of DigitalOcean, LLC (Conlan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of DigitalOcean, LLC (Connolly, Arthur) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Invincible IP LLC. (deBruin, David) Modified on 8/2/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP LLC. DigitalOcean, LLC served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,938,634 ;9,635,134 ;9,678,774. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DigitalOcean, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647461.) - filed by Invincible IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Conlan on behalf of DigitalOcean, LLC (Conlan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of DigitalOcean, LLC (Connolly, Arthur) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer (*Reset Answer Deadlines: DigitalOcean, LLC answer due 10/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/2/2021. (nms) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Invincible IP LLC. (deBruin, David) Modified on 8/2/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP LLC. DigitalOcean, LLC served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00954-RGA, 1:21-cv-00955-RGA, 1:21-cv-00956-RGA, 1:21-cv-00959-RGA, 1:21-cv-00960-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,938,634 ;9,635,134 ;9,678,774. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DigitalOcean, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647461.) - filed by Invincible IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Invincible IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin