This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:25:46 (UTC).

Invincible IP, LLC v. Citrix Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Invincible IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Citrix Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00954

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Invincible IP, LLC

Defendant

Citrix Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorney

Brian A. Biggs

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Strapp - filed by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to October 1, 2021 - filed by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP, LLC. Citrix Systems, Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,938,634; 8,954,993; 9,479,472; 9,635,134; 9,678,774. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Citrix Systems, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647261.) - filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Strapp, filed by Citrix Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Strapp - filed by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Citrix Systems, Inc. answer due 10/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/23/2021. (nms) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to October 1, 2021 - filed by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invincible IP, LLC. Citrix Systems, Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00954-RGA, 1:21-cv-00955-RGA, 1:21-cv-00956-RGA, 1:21-cv-00959-RGA, 1:21-cv-00960-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,938,634; 8,954,993; 9,479,472; 9,635,134; 9,678,774. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Citrix Systems, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3647261.) - filed by Invincible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Invincible IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Citrix Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin