This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 07:16:54 (UTC).

Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC v. Friends of Production Capital, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Friends of Production Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07260

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL, LLC

PRE PRODUCTION CAPITAL, LLC

Kevin Robl

PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC

Remington Chase

William Westwood

William Eliot

Does 1 thorugh 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Annigian Ryan LLP

114 North Indian Hill Boulevard Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

Frank C. Salzano

Attorney at Salzano Lampert and Wilson LLP

275 Madison Avenue, 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

James Timothy Ryan

Attorney at Annigian Ryan LLP

114 North Indian Hill Boulevard Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Frank C Salzano APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC, designating James T Ryan as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129646) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129646) filed by Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#17

(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pre Production Capital, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#16

(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Production Capital LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#15

(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Remington Chase. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#14

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kevin Robl. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC identifying Investors in Friends of Production Capital LLC as Corporate Parent. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC, identifying Friends of Production Capital, LLC; Pre Production Capital, LLC; Kevin Robl; Remington Chase (aka William Westwood, aka William Eliot; Production Capital LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#1

(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Friends of Production Capital, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Frank C Salzano APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC, designating James T Ryan as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129646) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129646) filed by Plaintiff Investors In Friends of Production Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pre Production Capital, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Production Capital LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Remington Chase. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kevin Robl. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Friends of Production Capital, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC identifying Investors in Friends of Production Capital LLC as Corporate Parent. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC, identifying Friends of Production Capital, LLC; Pre Production Capital, LLC; Kevin Robl; Remington Chase (aka William Westwood, aka William Eliot; Production Capital LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34104694 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC. (Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party INVESTORS IN FRIENDS OF PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC(pty:pla))(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less