This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 08:08:53 (UTC).

Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Datablaze, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Inventergy LBS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Datablaze, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02448

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inventergy LBS, LLC

Defendant

Datablaze, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Arthur Kent

Attorney at Kent & Risley, LLC

Suite 57, 5755 North Point Pkwy.

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Stephen Robert Risley

Attorney at Kent & Risley, LLC

Suite 57, 5755 North Point Pkwy.

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Isaac P. Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendant, by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Datablaze, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#4

(#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Datablaze, LLC. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B Preliminary Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A US Pat No 8,760,286

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8691481) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US Pat No 8,760,286, #2 Exhibit B Preliminary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Clerks Entry of Default as to Datablaze, LLC (jpa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendant, by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Datablaze, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Inventergy. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Issac P.l Rabicoff as to Inventergy LBS, LLC regarding #3 Order. (mlb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Datablaze, LLC. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (tmf) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8691481) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US Pat No 8,760,286, #2 Exhibit B Preliminary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less