This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 09:25:37 (UTC).

Intexact Technologies Limited v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On September 8, 2021, Intexact Technologies Limited (“Plaintiff” or “Intexact”), represented by Nicholas Netram Loaknauth of The Law Office of Nicholas Loaknauth, Esq., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“Defendant”). Plaintiff filed suit seeking declaratory relief and damages along with prejudgement and post-judgement interest among other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Southern District of New York.

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 7,161,483 (the “483 Patent”) (the “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the plaintiff. 

In the complaint the plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ‘483 Patent by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least ‘Samsung’s SmartThings Home Security System’ identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ‘483 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ‘483 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, other devices that infringe the claims of the ‘483 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

Further the plaintiff alleged that, “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ‘483 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ‘483 Patent.”

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant actively, knowingly, and intentionally has been and continues to induce infringement of the ‘483 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ‘483 Patent” and “Defendant actively, knowingly, and intentionally has been and continues materially contribute to their own customers’ infringement of the ‘483 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ‘483 Patent.”

There is one claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff for the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court for declaratory relief and an award for damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant’s past infringement, and with respect to the ‘483 patent, any continuing or future infringement, up until the date such judgment is entered including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284. Further, the plaintiff requested the court for reasonable attorneys’ fees, costs and expenses and any other relief the court just and proper. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07522

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Intexact Technologies Limited

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Netram Loaknauth

Attorney at The Law Office of Nicholas Loaknauth, Esq

1460 Broadway

New York, NY 10016

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Howard L. Wernow dated 10/06/2021. The request is granted. Defendant shall have until December 13, 2021 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. So ordered. #1 Complaint,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 12/13/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/6/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#11

(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Howard L. Wernow dated 10/06/2021. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/2021) (ks) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Declaration in Support with Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2: Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 7,161,483

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Howard L. Wernow dated 10/06/2021. The request is granted. Defendant shall have until December 13, 2021 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. So ordered. #1 Complaint,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 12/13/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/6/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Howard L. Wernow dated 10/06/2021. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/2021) (ks) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25053741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25053741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support with Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25035602)Document filed by Intexact Technologies Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 7,161,483, #2 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart).(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Netram Loaknauth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow