This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 08:08:46 (UTC).

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No 132 Health and Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Beckley Drilling Blasting Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00734

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132, AFL-CIO

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Health and Welfare Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 132 Annuity and Savings Fund,

Defendant

Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence B. Lowry

Attorney at BARRETT CHAFIN LOWRY & AMOS

P. O. Box 402

Huntington, WV 25708-0402

Defendant Attorneys

Shawn R. Romano

Attorney at ROMANO & OLIVIO

813 Quarrier Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Miles B. Berger

Attorney at ROMANO & ASSOCIATES

Suite 200, 230 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7410089. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/7/2019 as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002609389. (jsa)

#6

(#6) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)

#5

(#5) ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. (Romano, Shawn)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. (Romano, Shawn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/7/2019 as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002609389. (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beckley Drilling & Blasting Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7410089. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.