This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2021 at 08:11:58 (UTC).

Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers v. Alan Stone Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Alan Stone Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C. Nugent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C. Nugent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18

Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers

Defendant

Alan Stone Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy R. Fadel

Attorney at Fadel & Beyer

18500 Lake Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 3/24/2021 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/17/2021. (M,S) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#8

(#8) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Alan Stone Co., Inc. c/o Claudia A. Staley, Statutory Agent on 1/13/2021, filed on behalf of Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#6

(#6) USM Form 285 filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #4 .(Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons to Alan Stone Co., Inc. filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #4 .(Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion For Service by U.S. Marshal (Related Doc #2 ). Plaintiff instructed to file completed summons and USM 285 forms addressed to Respondent for use in issuance of service package. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/6/2021. (M,S) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Motion For Service by U.S. Marshall filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18. Related document(s) #1 . (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D: Step 2a Grievance Settlement Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C: Grievance

1 #2

Exhibit B: Acceptance of Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A: Ohio Highway Heavy Agreement

#1

(#1) Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Alan Stone Co., Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10540342. Filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ohio Highway Heavy Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Grievance, #4 Exhibit D - Step 2a Grievance Settlement Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 3/24/2021 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/17/2021. (M,S) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinancial Transaction in the amount of $2.00 received from Timothy Fadel. Receipt # 14660128971 Related document(s) #1 . (M,MT) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Alan Stone Co., Inc. c/o Claudia A. Staley, Statutory Agent on 1/13/2021, filed on behalf of Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons, USM 285 Form and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Alan Stone Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (M,S) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) USM Form 285 filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #4 .(Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons to Alan Stone Co., Inc. filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. Related document(s) #4 .(Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion For Service by U.S. Marshal (Related Doc #2 ). Plaintiff instructed to file completed summons and USM 285 forms addressed to Respondent for use in issuance of service package. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/6/2021. (M,S) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion For Service by U.S. Marshall filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18. Related document(s) #1 . (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Alan Stone Co., Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10540342. Filed by Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ohio Highway Heavy Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Grievance, #4 Exhibit D - Step 2a Grievance Settlement Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy R. Fadel(Designation Retained)