This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2020 at 07:31:54 (UTC).

International Union of Operating Engineers v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 International Union of Operating Engineers filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against F H Paschen, S N Nielsen Associates LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02499

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO

International Union of Operating Engineers

Defendants

F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC, an Illinois corporation

F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert A Paszta

Attorney at Iuoe Local 150 Legal Dept.

6140 Joliet Road

Countryside, IL 60525

Dale D. Pierson

Attorney at International Union of Operating Engineers

6140 Joliet Road

Countryside, IL 60525

James Connolly, Jr.

Attorney at Local 150 Legal Department

6140 Joliet Road

Countryside, IL 60525

Charles R Kiser

Attorney at IUOE Local 150 Legal Dept.

6141 Joliet Road

Countryside, IL 60525

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On plaintiff's notice #9 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International Union of Operating Engineers [Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)] (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by James Connolly, Jr (Connolly, James) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Charles R Kiser (Kiser, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit C-G

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT [VERIFIED] filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16951200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-G)(Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On plaintiff's notice #9 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International Union of Operating Engineers [Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)] (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by James Connolly, Jr (Connolly, James) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Charles R Kiser (Kiser, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT [VERIFIED] filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16951200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-G)(Pierson, Dale) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less