This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:12:32 (UTC).

International Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 International Refugee Assistance Project filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09519

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Refugee Assistance Project

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Department of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mariko Hirose

Alexandra Zaretsky

Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Assignment, Notice of Appearance of Kathryn Austin, and Court's Individual Rules served on United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of State on 12/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of State served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project..(Austin, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/30/2021) (jca) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#11

(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Appeal

1 #3

Exhibit C - State FOIA

1 #2

Exhibit B - USCIS FOIA

1 #1

Exhibit A - Permanent Links

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Assignment, Notice of Appearance of Kathryn Austin, and Court's Individual Rules served on United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of State on 12/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of State served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project..(Austin, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/30/2021) (jca) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexandra Zaretsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department of Homeland Security, Department of State. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariko Hirose on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project..(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) Modified on 11/18/2021 (pc). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25347167)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Permanent Links, #2 Exhibit B - USCIS FOIA, #3 Exhibit C - State FOIA, #4 Exhibit D - State Appeal).(Zaretsky, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less