This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 05:51:49 (UTC).

International Fur Trade Federation v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 International Fur Trade Federation filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Fur Trade Federation

Defendants

Dr. Grant Colfax

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Tenenbaum

Attorney at The Tenenbaum Law Firm

1431 Ocean Ave., Ste. 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2136

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF with jury demand against City and County of San Francisco, Grant Colfax (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14061966.). Filed by International Fur Trade Federation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tenenbaum, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Tenenbaum, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, Grant Colfax. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, Grant Colfax. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Tenenbaum, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF with jury demand against City and County of San Francisco, Grant Colfax (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14061966.). Filed by International Fur Trade Federation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tenenbaum, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.