Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2021 at 06:51:47 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC v. RING POWER CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against RING POWER CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC

Defendants

RING POWER CORPORATION

THOMPSON TRACTOR COMPANY INC

ZIEGLER, INC.

ZIEGLER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONATHAN SHAW

JAMES P. DENVIR

CHRISTOPHER G. RENNER

J. WELLS HARRELL

NATHAN ROGER HOESCHEN

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

AMY J. MAUSER

DAVID M. FRY

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

WILLIAM BLOOM

JOHN W SHAW

Attorney at JOHN W SHAW PA

1200 Main St, 3500 One Kansas City Place

Kansas City, MO 64105-3200

MICHAEL S MITCHELL

Attorney at BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP - WASHINGTON DC

1401 New York Avenue Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

NIELS P. MURPHY

GERRY A. GIURATO

Attorney at MURPHY ANDERSON ATTORNEYS AT LAW

1501 San Marco Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207

DOMINICK T. GATTUSO

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

NIELS PATRICK MURPHY

Attorney at MURPHY & ANDERSON PA - JACKSONVILLE FL

1501 San Marco Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207

ROBIN SUMNER

MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL

M. DUNCAN GRANT

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEREMY HEEP

JAMES HARRY STONE LEVINE

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP

1313 N. Market Street, P.O. Box 1709, Suite 5100

Wilmington, DE 19899-1709

HENRY E. GALLAGHER, JR.

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#350

(#350) ORDER re #349 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is GRANTED, and attorney Randall W. Bryer is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/22/2021. (blr) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

349 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#349

(#349) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randall W. Bryer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6144762.) by INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (BRYER, RANDALL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#348

(#348) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING THE PROTOCOL FOR CONDUCTING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS re #346 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/2/2021.(See order for complete details.) (blr) Modified to add hyperlink on 6/3/2021 (blr). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#347

(#347) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #346 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/2/2021. (See order for complete details.) (blr) Modified to add hyperlink on 6/3/2021 (blr). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

346 #2

Exhibit B - Remote Deposition Protocol

346 #1

Exhibit A - Protective Order

#346

(#346) Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions by INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Remote Deposition Protocol) (COLE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#345

(#345) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH JECK HULSBERG on behalf of RING POWER CORPORATION (HULSBERG, SARAH) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Denvir and Christopher G. Renner - filed by International Construction Products LLC. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Associated Auction Services LLC served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Komatsu America Corp. served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Caterpillar Inc. served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by International Construction Products LLC. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Associated Auction Services LLC, Caterpillar Inc., Komatsu America Corp., Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1664976.) - filed by International Construction Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

217 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#350) ORDER re #349 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is GRANTED, and attorney Randall W. Bryer is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/22/2021. (blr) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#349) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randall W. Bryer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6144762.) by INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (BRYER, RANDALL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#348) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING THE PROTOCOL FOR CONDUCTING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS re #346 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/2/2021.(See order for complete details.) (blr) Modified to add hyperlink on 6/3/2021 (blr). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#347) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #346 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/2/2021. (See order for complete details.) (blr) Modified to add hyperlink on 6/3/2021 (blr). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#346) Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Concerning the Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions by INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Remote Deposition Protocol) (COLE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#345) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH JECK HULSBERG on behalf of RING POWER CORPORATION (HULSBERG, SARAH) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#344) ORDER granting #343 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David E. Cole is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/24/2021. (blr) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #343 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Cole. (Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6001549.) (blr) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#343) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Cole.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6001549.) by INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (COLE, DAVID) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) ORDER granting #341 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William A. Isaacson is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/29/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Denvir and Christopher G. Renner - filed by International Construction Products LLC. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Associated Auction Services LLC served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Komatsu America Corp. served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Construction Products LLC. Caterpillar Inc. served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Shaw, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Associated Auction Services LLC on 1/29/2015; Caterpillar Inc. on 1/29/2015; Komatsu America Corp. on 1/29/2015; Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC on 1/29/2015. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by International Construction Products LLC. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Associated Auction Services LLC, Caterpillar Inc., Komatsu America Corp., Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1664976.) - filed by International Construction Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZIEGLER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RING POWER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Wells Harrell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL S MITCHELL