This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 10:55:23 (UTC).

International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Merck Sharp Dohme Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C

Defendant

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Earl Collins

Attorney at Glenn Feldmann Darby & Goodlatte

37 Campbell Avenue, S.W.

Roanoke, VA 24011

Paul Graham Beers

Attorney at Glenn Feldmann Darby & Goodlatte

37 Campbell Avenue, S.W.

Roanoke, VA 24011

Jonathan K. Walters

Attorney at Markowitz & Richman

123 S. Broad St, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Henry Schnetzler

Attorney at Frith Anderson & Peake PC

29 Franklin Road, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/14/2020. (jv)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Answer due 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/7/20. (kld)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

#11

(#11) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/21/2020. (jv)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020.(Beers, Paul)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Jonathan Walters, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3423314. by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Christopher)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(kld)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C (Collins, Christopher)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/14/2020. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#15) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Answer due 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/7/20. (kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/21/2020. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Filing Requirement to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020.(Beers, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Oral ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jonathan K. Walters for International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/29/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Jonathan Walters, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3423314. by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C (Collins, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3421926), filed by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of 1/11/2019 Hearing, #3 Exhibit C - Arbitrator Issued Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less