This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2021 at 09:26:30 (UTC).

International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. United Airlines

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 International Brotherhood of Teamsters filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against United Airlines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03983

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Brotherhood of Teamsters

Defendant

United Airlines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick Edward Deady

Attorney at Hogan Marren Babbo & Rose, Ltd.

321 North Clark Street, Suite 1301

Chicago, IL 60654

Jeffrey Andrew Bartos

Attorney at Guerrieri Clayman Bartos & Parcelli, Pc

1625 Massachusetts Ave., Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Civil case terminated #6 . Mailed notice. (ewf, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Jeffrey Andrew Bartos (Bartos, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (lxk, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Patrick Edward Deady (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18502563.(Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Teamsters is a litigant

Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Andrew Bartos