This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 09:00:45 (UTC).

International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al v. Allegiant Air, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Allegiant Air, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00374

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division

Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118

Defendant

Allegiant Air, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Urban

Attorney at The Urban Law Firm

4270 South Decatur Blvd., Suite A-9

Las Vegas, NV 89103

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron S Markel

Attorney at Jones Day

150 West Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Douglas Ward Hall

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Deverie J. Christensen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

300 S. Fourth Street, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Joshua A Sliker

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

300 S. Fourth Street, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

14 #5

Exhibit 4

14 #4

Exhibit 3

14 #3

Exhibit 2

14 #2

Exhibit 1

14 #1

Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Bill Fishburn

#14

12 #2

Declaration of Andrew J. Robles

12 #1

Declaration of Michael A. Urban

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

5 #4

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

5 #3

Declaration Aaron Markel in Support of Motion to Dismiss

5 #2

Declaration Bill Fishburn in Support of Motion to Dismiss

5 #1

Declaration Trent Porter in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#5

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Bill Fishburn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #12 filed by attorney Michael Urban. The court has corrected and changed the event from Reply to Response. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE REPLY to #5 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118. Replies due by 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Urban, #2 Declaration of Andrew J. Robles) (Urban, Michael) Modified event and set Reply deadline on 4/14/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aaron S. Markel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/31/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission for Douglas W Hall to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Deverie J Christensen. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/31/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aaron S. Markel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6426727) by Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas W. Hall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6426707) by Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:20-cv-01866-APG-DJA by Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allegiant Air, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Allegiant Travel Co., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate John Redmond, Other Affiliate Scott Sheldon, Other Affiliate Maurice J. Gallagher for Allegiant Air, LLC added. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. Responses due by 4/13/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Trent Porter in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Bill Fishburn in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Aaron Markel in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Sliker, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118 re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Urban, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Allegiant Air, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Urban, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6394002) by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division and Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118. Proof of service due by 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Urban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/5/2021 to add additional filer (SLD). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLEGIANT AIR LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Teamsters is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas W Hall(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A Sliker