This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 10:48:35 (UTC).

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 v. Brent Electric Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Brent Electric Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terence Kern, Jodi F Jayne and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00103

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terence Kern

Referral Judges

Jodi F Jayne

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Brent Electric Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Frank W Frasier, III

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Glenda Pittman

Attorney at Glenda Pittman @ Associates, P.C.

4807 Spicewood Springs Road, Building 1, Suite 1245

Austin, TX 78759

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

R. Eddie Wayland

Attorney at King & Ballow

315 Union Street, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

Kevin Pierce Doyle

Attorney at Pray Walker PC

100 W 5Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74103-4292

Robert Mitchener, III

Attorney at Pray Walker PC

100 W 5Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74103-4292

Alexander Robert Telarik

Attorney at Pray Walker, P.C.

100 West Fifth Street, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Mark E Hunt

Attorney at King & Ballow

315 Union Street, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#23

#20

19 #1

Exhibit 1

#19

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#18

17 #20

Exhibit T

17 #19

Exhibit S

17 #18

Exhibit R

17 #17

Exhibit Q

17 #16

Exhibit P

17 #15

Exhibit O

17 #14

Exhibit N

17 #13

Exhibit M

17 #12

Exhibit L

17 #11

Exhibit K

17 #10

Exhibit J

17 #9

Exhibit I

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Motion by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Pittman, Glenda) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-103-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Brent Electric Co., Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Mark E. Hunt and R. Eddie Wayland are admitted Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Brent Electric Company, Inc. ; adding attorney R. Eddie Wayland for Brent Electric Co., Inc.,R. Eddie Wayland for Brent Electric Co., Inc. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Eddie Wayland to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2387402) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark E. Hunt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2387397) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Pittman, Glenda) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Glenda Pittman on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 [Note: Attorney Glenda Pittman added to party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584(pty:pla).] (Pittman, Glenda) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Glenda L. Pittman is granted leave to proceed Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. ; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Attorney(s) Glenda L. Pittman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2369748) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (With attachments) (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank W Frasier, III on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Brent Electric Co., Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2369160) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brent Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 139 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenda Pittman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank W Frasier, III