This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 07:21:40 (UTC).

International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, Transportation Division filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division

Defendant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kevin C. Brodar

Attorney at Smart-Transportation Division

24950 Country Club Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44070

Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons

Attorney at United Transportation Union

24950 Country Club Blvd.

North Olmsted, OH 44070

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal. Related document #3 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/14/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - Award

#1

(#1) Petition to enforce public law award under the railway labor act against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9117510. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Award, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal. Related document #3 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/14/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition to enforce public law award under the railway labor act against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9117510. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Award, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less