This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2020 at 08:21:39 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 v. A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19 filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against A T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05163

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19

Defendants

A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC doing business as RELIANT COMMERCIAL KITCHEN INSTALLERS agent of A&T SOLUTIONS agent of ATS INSTALLERS

A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC doing business as RELIANT COMMERCIAL KITCHEN INSTALLERS also known as A&T SOLUTIONS also known as ATS INSTALLERS

A&T SOLUTIONS

ATS INSTALLERS

A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as ATS INSTALLERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN WILLIAM MILZ

Attorney at SPEAR, WILDERMAN, P.C.

230 South Broad Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

JONATHAN LANDESMAN

Attorney at COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC

30 South 17Th St., 19Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MARC B. CYTRYN

Attorney at Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman, P.C.

30 South 17Th Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME BY AND THROUGH THEIR REPRESENTATIVE COUNSEL, THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS, A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC D/B/A RELIANT COMMERCIAL KITCHEN INSTALLERS A/K/A ATS INSTALLERS, A/K/A A&T SOLUTIONS, AND A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. D/B/A ATS INSTALLERS (COLLECTIVELY, DEFENDANTS), TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL DECEMBER 17, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/1/20. 12/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC; A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 12/3/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC B. CYTRYN on behalf of A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. with Certificate of Service(CYTRYN, MARC) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN LANDESMAN on behalf of A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Hahn re: served Affidavit of Service A&T Solutions, Inc. dba ATS Installers upon Mike Tally by Hand Delivery on 10/22/20, answer due 11/12/20. (MILZ, MARTIN) Modified on 10/27/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Hahn re: served Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service - A&T Equipment Transport-Installs, LLC dba Reliant Commercial Kitchen Installers aka ATS Installers, aka and T Solutions upon Mike Tally by Hand Delivery on 10/22/20, answer due 11/12/20. (MILZ, MARTIN) Modified on 10/27/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/21/20. 10/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14643996.), filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19.(MILZ, MARTIN) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME BY AND THROUGH THEIR REPRESENTATIVE COUNSEL, THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS, A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC D/B/A RELIANT COMMERCIAL KITCHEN INSTALLERS A/K/A ATS INSTALLERS, A/K/A A&T SOLUTIONS, AND A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. D/B/A ATS INSTALLERS (COLLECTIVELY, DEFENDANTS), TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL DECEMBER 17, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/1/20. 12/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC; A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 12/3/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC B. CYTRYN on behalf of A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. with Certificate of Service(CYTRYN, MARC) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN LANDESMAN on behalf of A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Hahn re: served Affidavit of Service A&T Solutions, Inc. dba ATS Installers upon Mike Tally by Hand Delivery on 10/22/20, answer due 11/12/20. (MILZ, MARTIN) Modified on 10/27/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Hahn re: served Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service - A&T Equipment Transport-Installs, LLC dba Reliant Commercial Kitchen Installers aka ATS Installers, aka and T Solutions upon Mike Tally by Hand Delivery on 10/22/20, answer due 11/12/20. (MILZ, MARTIN) Modified on 10/27/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/21/20. 10/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/19/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against A&T EQUIPMENT TRANSPORT/INSTALLS, LLC, A&T SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14643996.), filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL & TRANSPORTATION WORKERS, SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 19.(MILZ, MARTIN) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less