This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 15:28:16 (UTC).

International Artists Touring Corp. v. Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 International Artists Touring Corp filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Lawrence King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20271

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Artists Touring Corp.

Defendant

Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Matthew Bander

Attorney at Bander Law Firm PLLC

174 Ne 96Th Street

Miami, FL 33138

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center. Responses due by 3/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Catala, Maria) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Catala on behalf of Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center. Attorney Maria Catala added to party Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center (pty:dft). (Catala, Maria) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Artists Touring Corp. re #3 Summons Issued as to USA (Bander, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, California Service Center. (ar2) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kathy A Baran. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12328879, filed by International Artists Touring Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Bander, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.