This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:33:29 (UTC).

Internal Revenue Service v. Palmieri

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Internal Revenue Service filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Palmieri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Internal Revenue Service

Defendant

Palmieri

Intervenor Defendants

Karen Witt

Speciality Industries II, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Robert Recchia

Attorney at Nicholas R. Recchia, Attorney At Law

1000 Plaza Drive, Suite 680

Schaumburg, IL 60173

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/2020. (pj, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) INTERVENOR complaint filed by Karen Witt, Speciality Industries II, LLC against Internal Revenue Service(Recchia, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/2020. (pj, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) INTERVENOR complaint filed by Karen Witt, Speciality Industries II, LLC against Internal Revenue Service(Recchia, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less