This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2021 at 08:58:15 (UTC).

INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY et al v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01620

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES MCRITCHIE

AS YOU SOW

INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY

Defendant

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Kelsey Kry

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN, LLP

600 New Hampshire Ave. N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20037

Eric Posner

Sarah Justine Newman

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20037

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Matro

Attorney at U.S. SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #2

Text of Proposed Order

13 #1

Declaration

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Posner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Posner, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Certified Index due by 8/19/2021. Summary Judgment motions due by 9/20/2021. Cross Motions due by 11/19/2021. Status Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #12 Joint Statement and Proposed Scheduling Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) on or before August 19, 2021, the defendant shall file a certified index of the administrative record; (2) on or before September 20, 2021, the plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment; (3) on or before November 19, 2021, the defendant shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment, with a combined memorandum in opposition to the plaintiffs' motion and in support of its cross-motion; and (4) on or before December 10, 2021, the plaintiffs shall file their combined opposition to the defendant's cross-motion and reply in support of their motion. It is further ORDERED that, on March 7, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the parties' motions. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Eric A. Posner, MoloLamken LLP, 300 North LaSalle Street, Chicago, IL 60654, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2021. (lcr bw1) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric A. Posner, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8617755. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AS YOU SOW, INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY, JAMES MCRITCHIE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kry, Robert) Modified event title on 7/23/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Justine Newman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newman, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 6, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Matro on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Matro, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/25/2021. (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2021. (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 6/29/2021 (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (additional summonses for Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office) filed by INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY, AS YOU SOW, JAMES MCRITCHIE. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AS YOU SOW (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8528428) filed by INTERFAITH CENTER ON CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY, AS YOU SOW, JAMES MCRITCHIE. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Kelsey Kry