This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2021 at 08:19:19 (UTC).

Intelligent Assembly, LLC v. Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Intelligent Assembly, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61663

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Intelligent Assembly, LLC

Defendants

Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation

Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorney

Bruno Reategui

1990, 1111 Brickell Bay Dr

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#5

(#5) STRICKEN Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 8/17/2021 per DE #7 Notice (kpe). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (mee) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

1 #7

Summon(s)

1 #6

Summon(s)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-Claim Chart (Torque Wrench)

1 #3

Exhibit C-Claim Chart (600 MCM Crimper)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Licensing Offer

1 #1

Exhibit A-US6553321

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Defendant Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation shall file its response by October 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/27/2021. (cbn) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, and to File its Corporate Disclosure by Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. Attorney Bruno Reategui added to party Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reategui, Bruno) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Striking #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intelligent Assembly, LLC by Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Document Not Related to Case; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking. (kpe) Modified text on 8/17/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STRICKEN Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 8/17/2021 per DE #7 Notice (kpe). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (mee) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14917987, filed by Intelligent Assembly, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6553321, #2 Exhibit B-Licensing Offer, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart (600 MCM Crimper), #4 Exhibit D-Claim Chart (Torque Wrench), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION is a litigant